skip to content

Siow, Yin-Hui

CPSO#: 66696

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Radiology/Nuclear Imaging Dept
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905 895 4521 Ext. 2716 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: 905 883 1212 Ext. 7112
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Suite 216
Vaughan ON  L6A4P9
Canada
Phone: 289 553 5040
Fax: 289 553 6336
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Graham ( CPSO# 30863 )
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 33512 )
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. L. Thain ( CPSO# 59614 )
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )
Dr. N. Langhorne ( CPSO# 68045 )
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 69076 )
Dr. P. Zia ( CPSO# 71413 )
Dr. E. Silmberg ( CPSO# 71544 )
Dr. F. Lan ( CPSO# 72316 )
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )
Dr. F. Budhani ( CPSO# 86329 )

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3


Corporation Name: Y Siow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )

Business Address:
216 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-5040

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Radiology / Nuclear Imaging Department
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YIN-HUI SIOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIOW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998