skip to content

Mussani, Yasmin

CPSO#: 28248

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arbor Trace Alzheimers Special Care
120 Chelton Rd
London ON  N5M 0C9
Phone: (519) 681-0002
Fax: (519) 681-0004 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yasmin Mussani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Mussani ( CPSO# 28248 )

Business Address:
120 Chelton Road
London ON  N5M 0C9

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YASMIN MUSSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSANI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2019