First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Apr 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Dec 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Oct 2011 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 17 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Apr 2019 |