skip to content

Xu, Zhaodong

CPSO#: 89242

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:China Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Department of Pathology and Lab Medicine 501 Smyth Road Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 12 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2018