THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 11:46:11 AM
Xu, Zhaodong
CPSO#:
89242
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Sep 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: China Medical University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Pathology and Lab Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 12 Jun 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2018 |