skip to content

Wong, Louise Lon Yin

CPSO#: 92173

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hope Medical Clinic
16775 Yonge St.
Suite 214
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8J4
Phone: 905 895 9777
Fax: 905 895 9720 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Louise Lon Yin Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wong ( CPSO# 92173 )

Business Address:
All Med Health
Unit 1
16880 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 895-9777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LOUISE LON YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011