THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 7:05:25 AM
Wong, Louise Lon Yin
CPSO#:
92173
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Bristol Medical School, University of Br, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hope Medical Clinic
16775 Yonge St.
Suite 214
Newmarket ON L3Y 8J4
Phone: 905 895 9777
Fax: 905 895 9720
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Oct 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOUISE LON YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 20 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2011 |