skip to content

Wiwcharuk, Gillian Lynne

CPSO#: 88657

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2022
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education: McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Wiwcharuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2022
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford, ON
N3R 1G9
Date Received: 20 Jul 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2022