THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:11:05 AM
Wiwcharuk, Gillian Lynne
CPSO#:
88657
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: McMaster University, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Wiwcharuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford, ON
N3R 1G9
Date Received: 20 Jul 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:19 Oct 2015 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |