skip to content

Wilson, Aze Suzanne Aliu

CPSO#: 88377

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
PO box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3832
Fax: (519) 663-3220 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

310 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 4P4
Canada
Phone: (519) 433-4700
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aze Wilson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Corporation Name: Aze Wilson Medicine Professional
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wilson ( CPSO# 88377 )

Business Address:
1256 Bramblewood St
-
-
-
London ON  N6K 4X1
Phone Number: 519-318-0466

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:20 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AZE SUZANNE ALIU WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Oct 2013 to 20 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2012