THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:15:12 AM
Wilson, Aze Suzanne Aliu
CPSO#:
88377
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus
Division of Gastroenterology
PO box 5339
339 Windermere Road
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3832
Fax: (519) 663-3220
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:20 Nov 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AZE SUZANNE ALIU WILSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 08 Oct 2013 to 20 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Nov 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2012 |