skip to content

Cheng, Willoon Wai Ming

CPSO#: 74361

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
Unit 13
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: (519) 842-3793 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. W. Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Cheng ( CPSO# 74361 )

Business Address:
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 5A7
Phone Number: (519) 842-4231

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jul 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WILLOON WAI MING CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 1999 to 21 Nov 1999
EL - Emergency Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2018

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 03 May 2022
Summary:

Allegations the member had engaged in professional misconduct came before the Discipline Committee, now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal, by Notice of Hearing dated June 9, 2021. The Tribunal hearing was held January 31, 2022 to February 3, 2022. In reasons issued May 3, 2022, the Tribunal found that the College had failed to prove the allegations of misconduct. More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): January 31 to February 3, 2022