THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 17:33:48 PM
Cheng, Willoon Wai Ming
CPSO#:
74361
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Tillsonburg Medical Centre
Unit 13
200 Broadway Street
Tillsonburg ON N4G 5A7
Phone: (519) 842-4231
Fax: (519) 842-3793
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jul 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLOON WAI MING CHENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHENG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 1999 to 21 Nov 1999
EL - Emergency Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2001 to 31 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Oct 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Nov 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2000 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jul 2002 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2018 |