skip to content

Wickrama Arachchilage, Thamara

CPSO#: 89794

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Wickramaarachchilage, Thamara Malkanthi Jayasinghe (used until: 27 May 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Colombo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T. Wickrama Arachchilage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Wickrama Arachchilage ( CPSO# 89794 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:24 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. THAMARA WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 17 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2008 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2009 to 24 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2010 to 24 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2011 to 23 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2018