THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 11:17:18 AM
Wickrama Arachchilage, Thamara
CPSO#:
89794
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Wickramaarachchilage, Thamara Malkanthi Jayasinghe (used until: 27 May 2018 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Colombo, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: 8076847049
Electoral District: 09
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:24 Aug 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. THAMARA WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WICKRAMA ARACHCHILAGE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 17 Nov 2008
AVP - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 18 Nov 2008 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2009 to 24 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2010 to 24 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2011 to 23 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 24 Aug 2012 to 25 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Aug 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2018 |