White, Bradley Joseph (CPSO#: 100592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Phone: (705) 739-8989
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1070 Innisfil Beach Road
Innisfil ON  L9S 4T9
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

1 - 2 Massey St
Angus ON  L0M 1B0
Canada
Phone: (249) 877-5414
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

79C Dunlop St W
Barrie ON  L4N 1A5
Canada
Phone: 705-739-8989
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

104 - 30 Martha St
Bolton ON  L7E 5V1
Canada
Phone: (905) 951-1912
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

477 Grove St E
Barrie ON  L4M 6M3
Canada
Phone: (249) 877-5414
Fax: (705) 739-8987
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

420 Leacock Dr
Barrie ON  L4N 5G5
Canada
Phone: (249) 877-5414
Fax: (705) 739-8987
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. White ( CPSO# 100592)
Dr. J. White ( CPSO# 102251)

Business Address:
21 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Phone Number: (705) 739-8989

Business Address:
1070 Innisfil Beach Road
Innisfil ON  L9S 4T9
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
76 C Dunlop West
Barrie ON  L4N 1A5
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
Unit 1-2
Massey Street
Angus ON  L0M 1B0
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
104 - 30 Martha Street
Bolton ON  L7E 5V1
Phone Number: (905) 951-1912

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY JOSEPH WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2015