skip to content

White, Jennifer Patricia

CPSO#: 102251

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Oct 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Wilson, Jennifer Patricia (used until: 11 Nov 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College of Dublin, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Essa Rd
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Phone: 705-739-8989
Fax: 705-739-8987 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. White ( CPSO# 100592)
Dr. J. White ( CPSO# 102251)

Business Address:
21 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 3K4
Phone Number: (705) 739-8989

Business Address:
1070 Innisfil Beach Road
Innisfil ON  L9S 4T9
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
76 C Dunlop West
Barrie ON  L4N 1A5
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
Unit 1-2
Massey Street
Angus ON  L0M 1B0
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
200 Wellington Street
Barrie ON  L4N 1K9

Business Address:
477 Grove Street East
Barrie ON  L4M 6M3
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
420 Leacock Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 5G5
Phone Number: (249) 877-5414

Business Address:
104 - 30 Martha Street
Bolton ON  L7E 5V1
Phone Number: (905) 951-1912

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNIFER PATRICIA WHITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2015