skip to content

Wheatcroft, Mark David

CPSO#: 94366

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5212
Fax: (416) 864-6012 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Wheatcroft Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wheatcroft ( CPSO# 94366 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective:01 Jun 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 18 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery

University Of Toronto, 19 Nov 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jun 2018 Active
             Dr.  Mark  David  Wheatcroft  may  practise  medicine independently in vascular
            surgery.