THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 9:57:05 AM
Wheatcroft, Mark David
CPSO#:
94366
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Vascular Surgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5212
Fax: (416) 864-6012
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:01 Jun 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 18 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jun 2018 |
|
Active |