skip to content

Watt, Man-Joe

CPSO#: 28900

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1989

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10230 - 111 Avenue
Edmonton AB  T5G 0B7
Phone: (780) 735-7918 Ext. 15444
Fax: (780) 735-7907

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 Townline Road
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K6
Canada
Phone: 9057281673
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 26 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAN-JOE WATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1989