THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 10:03:21 AM
Watt, Man-Joe
CPSO#:
28900
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Sep 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10230 - 111 Avenue
Edmonton AB T5G 0B7
Phone: (780) 735-7918 Ext. 15444
Fax: (780) 735-7907
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:26 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAN-JOE WATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 27 Dec 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Sep 1989 |