skip to content

Watkins, Jessica Anne

CPSO#: 91446

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Collings, Jessica Anne (used until: 10 Apr 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L2V7
Phone: (613)548-7827 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J.A. Watkins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Watkins ( CPSO# 91446 )

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre - KGH Site
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:26 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE WATKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2010 to 26 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 01 Mar 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2014