THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 17:52:24 PM
Watkins, Jessica Anne
CPSO#:
91446
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Nov 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Collings, Jessica Anne (used until: 10 Apr 2014 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
800 John Marks Ave
Kingston ON K7K 0J7
Phone: 613-507-7246
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:26 Aug 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JESSICA ANNE WATKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WATKINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 27 Aug 2010 to 26 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 27 Aug 2011 to 26 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 27 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 27 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 01 Mar 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2014 |