skip to content

Ward, Michael Robert

CPSO#: 95961

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd.
London ON  N6A5A5
Phone: 5196858500 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Cardiac Clinic
829 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 1C2
Canada
Phone: 416-883-3783
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

MyHealth Cardiology
279 Wharncliffe Rd N
Suite 210
London ON  N6H 2C2
Canada
Phone: 519-672-0070
Fax: 519-850-0144
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Ward Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ward ( CPSO# 95961 )

Business Address:
CoreCare
Suite 410
325 Milner Avenue
Toronto ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Business Address:
829 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6C 1C2
Phone Number: (416) 883-3783

Business Address:
279 Wharncliffe Rd N
Unit 210
London ON  N6H 2C2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:28 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 29 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015