THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 23:58:18 PM
Ward, Michael Robert
CPSO#:
95961
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 2011
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
University Hospital
339 Windermere Rd.
London ON N6A5A5
Phone: 5196858500
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:28 Jul 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:18 Oct 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ROBERT WARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 29 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2014 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 2015 |