skip to content

Wanono, Revital

CPSO#: 86070

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
Suite 214 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-6079
Fax: (905) 858-8835 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Revital Wanono Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wanono ( CPSO# 86070 )
Dr. D. Klein ( CPSO# 99666 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
531 Atkinson Aveune
Thornhill ON  L4J 8L7
Phone Number: (905) 731-5554

Business Address:
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
214 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:04 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REVITAL WANONO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANONO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
EL - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
EL - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2013