THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:23:25 PM
Wanono, Revital
CPSO#:
86070
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 May 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
Suite 214 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-6079
Fax: (905) 858-8835
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:04 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REVITAL WANONO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANONO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 30 Apr 2007
EL - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 May 2013 |