skip to content

Wang, Wen-Shan

CPSO#: 23952

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Jun 2015
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Dublin, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Website: www.rsrs.com Telephone: 416-398-0638 Fax: 416-398-5932 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 29 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2015

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: February 20, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Wen-Shan Wang has voluntarily ceased the practice of medicine, effective February 20, 2015.