THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 16:12:47 PM
Wang, Wen-Shan
CPSO#:
23952
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jan 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Mandarin
Education: University of Dublin, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6
Website: www.rsrs.com
Telephone: 416-398-0638
Fax: 416-398-5932
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 29 Jan 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2015 |
Concerns
Source:
QA Committee
Active Date: February 20, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Wen-Shan Wang has voluntarily ceased the practice of medicine, effective February 20, 2015.