skip to content

Wallace, George

CPSO#: 23312

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Oct 2003

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send their written request to: Appletree Medical Group 2573 Baseline Road. Ottawa, ON K2H 7B3
Date Received: 08 May 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:01 Dec 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013