THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 6:01:56 AM
Wallace, George
CPSO#:
23312
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Oct 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may send their written request to:
Appletree Medical Group
2573 Baseline Road.
Ottawa, ON
K2H 7B3
Date Received: 08 May 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Dec 1970 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jul 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 1970 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 20 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2013 |