skip to content

Vasquez, Raul Augusto

CPSO#: 84863

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Solutions Healthcare
Unit A
445 Centre St. N.
Napanee ON  K7R 3S4
Phone: (613) 3546072
Fax: (613) 3540562 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

343 Amherst Dr
Kingston ON  K7N 1X3
Canada
Phone: (613) 3844585
Fax: (613) 3849407
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

375 James st.
Gananoque ON  K7G2Z1
Canada
Phone: 6133824752
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

94 Charles street North
Gananoque ON  K7G 1T7
Canada
Phone: 613-382-4255
Fax: 613-382-4876
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

unit # 4
235 Montreal St.
Kingston ON  K7K 3G6
Canada
Phone: 613-766-2224
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

89 Richmond Blvd
Napanee ON  K7R 3S1
Canada
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raul A. Vasquez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vasquez ( CPSO# 84863 )

Business Address:
Carveth Care Centre
375 James Street
Gananoque ON  K7G 2Z1
Phone Number: (613) 382-4752

Business Address:
Solutions Healthcare
94 Charles Street North
Gananoque ON  K7G 1T7
Phone Number: (613) 382-4255

Business Address:
Solutions Healthcare
445 Centre Street North
Unit A
Napanee ON  K7R 3S4
Phone Number: (613) 966-4045

Business Address:
Helen Henderson Care Centre
343 Amherst Drive
Amherstview ON  K7N 1X3
Phone Number: (613) 384-4585


Corporation Name: Dr. Smith and Vasquez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vasquez ( CPSO# 84863 )
Dr. S. Smith ( CPSO# 58890 )

Business Address:
445 Centre Street North
Unit A
Napanee ON  K7R 3S4
Phone Number: (613) 354-6072

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAUL AUGUSTO VASQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASQUEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2009