THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:13:14 AM
Vasquez, Raul Augusto
CPSO#:
84863
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Feb 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Feb 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Central De Venezuela, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Solutions Healthcare
Unit A
445 Centre St. N.
Napanee ON K7R 3S4
Phone: (613) 3546072
Fax: (613) 3540562
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAUL AUGUSTO VASQUEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VASQUEZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2009 |