skip to content

Vasilescu Padure, Viorica

CPSO#: 85337

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Carol Davila Univ of Medicine & Pharmacy, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
AVP - Community Medicine

University Of Toronto, 21 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015