THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 20:06:00 PM
Vasilescu Padure, Viorica
CPSO#:
85337
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 Aug 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Carol Davila Univ of Medicine & Pharmacy, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 20 Sep 2006
AVP - Community Medicine
University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 14 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |