skip to content

Vartian, Brian Alex

CPSO#: 90745

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
131 Frederick Campbell St
Groves Memorial Hospital
Fergus ON  N1M 0H3
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: 519-843-7288 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vartian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Vartian ( CPSO# 90745 )

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN ALEX VARTIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARTIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012