THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 10:46:55 AM
Vartian, Brian Alex
CPSO#:
90745
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Dec 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
Department of Anesthesiology
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Groves Memorial Community Hospital |
Fergus |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:11 Dec 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRIAN ALEX VARTIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VARTIAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 02 May 2011 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2011 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2012 |