skip to content

Varga, Anthony Tibor

CPSO#: 17371

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 1999
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1963 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1999

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 1994
Summary:

 In June 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Varga guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession in the management, treatment and care of his patient.  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Varga be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand 
 to be recorded on the Register.  He was also to be fined the sum of $5000.00, and the Committee 
 recommended that the Doctor's name and these penalties be published in the College bulletin.  In 
 the event that Dr. Varga failed to pay the fine within thirty days of this Order becoming final, 
 the Committee ruled that his licence to practice would be suspended until such time as payment was 
 made.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 22 May 1996
Hearing Date(s): Jun 21, 1994