THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:38:35 PM
Varga, Anthony Tibor
CPSO#:
17371
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Jan 1960
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1958
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:01 Jan 1963 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 1960 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 1999 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 1994
Summary:
In June 1994, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Varga guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in the management, treatment and care of his patient. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Varga be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. He was also to be fined the sum of $5000.00, and the Committee recommended that the Doctor's name and these penalties be published in the College bulletin. In the event that Dr. Varga failed to pay the fine within thirty days of this Order becoming final, the Committee ruled that his licence to practice would be suspended until such time as payment was made.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 1996-05-22
Hearing Date(s): Jun 21, 1994