skip to content

Vania, Mariam

CPSO#: 29570

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
16 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1977

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 08 Jun 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:10 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jul 2021