THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 3:43:28 AM
Vania, Mariam
CPSO#:
29570
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
16 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Aug 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 08 Jun 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:10 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 1968 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Aug 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jul 2021 |