skip to content

Vanast, Walter John

CPSO#: 20982

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Sep 1996

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nova Scotia
Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:20 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1974 to 31 Dec 1974
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1975 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 28 Feb 1976
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Dec 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 2020