THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:49:02 PM
Vanast, Walter John
CPSO#:
20982
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Sep 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, French
Education: University of Toronto, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:20 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1973 to 30 Jun 1974
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1974 to 31 Dec 1974
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jan 1975 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 4 - General Pathology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 28 Feb 1976
Resident 4 - General Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1967 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Dec 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Oct 1978 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Sep 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2020 |