skip to content

Van Mieghem, Tim Nicole Constant

CPSO#: 96852

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 May 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 May 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, Flemish, French

Education:Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Obstetrics and Gynae
Suite 3-912
700 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone: 416 586 4800 Ext. 6406 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tim Van Mieghem Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Van Mieghem ( CPSO# 96852 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
700 University Avenue
Room 3-912
Toronto ON  M5G 1Z5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 10 May 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
Clinical Fellow - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2016

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Tim Nicole Constant Van Mieghem may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Obstetrics and Gynaecology, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Van
                        Mieghem  holds  an  academic  appointment  at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically expires  when  Dr.  Van
                  Mieghem no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.