THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 7:53:32 AM
Van Mieghem, Tim Nicole Constant
CPSO#:
96852
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Nov 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
10 May 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English, Flemish, French
Education: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Obstetrics and Gynae
Suite 3-912
700 University Ave
Toronto ON M5G 1Z5
Phone: 416 586 4800 Ext. 6406
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:10 May 2016 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 16 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
CF - Maternal Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2016 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 14 Nov 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Oct 2022 |
|
Active |