skip to content

Van Lierop, Muriel Joan

CPSO#: 22994

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Apr 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Van-Lierop, Muriel Joan (used until: 22 Jul 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
205 - 1246 Yonge St
Toronto ON  M4T 1W5
Phone: (416) 229-1993
Fax: (416) 229-0527 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Muriel J. Van Lierop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Lierop ( CPSO# 22994 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
1246 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 1W5
Phone Number: (416) 229-1993

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MURIEL JOAN VAN LIEROP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN LIEROP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jan 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1975