THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 0:36:39 AM
Van Lierop, Muriel Joan
CPSO#:
22994
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Apr 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Apr 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Van-Lierop, Muriel Joan (used until: 22 Jul 1991 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
205 - 1246 Yonge St
Toronto ON M4T 1W5
Phone: (416) 229-1993
Fax: (416) 229-0527
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Muriel J. Van Lierop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 10 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MURIEL JOAN VAN LIEROP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN LIEROP is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1970 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jan 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Apr 1975 |