skip to content

Van Jaarsveld, Barend Petrus

CPSO#: 85855

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chelsea Court Health Centre
779 Chelsea Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6J8
Phone: (613) 342-1199
Fax: (613) 342-2900 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Van Jaarsveld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Van Jaarsveld ( CPSO# 85855 )

Business Address:
Chelsea Court Health Centre
779 Chlesea Street
Brockville ON  K6V 6J8
Phone Number: (613) 342-1199

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BAREND PETRUS VAN JAARSVELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN JAARSVELD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2009