THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 9:45:02 AM
Van Jaarsveld, Barend Petrus
CPSO#:
85855
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Chelsea Court Health Centre
779 Chelsea Street
Brockville ON K6V 6J8
Phone: (613) 342-1199
Fax: (613) 342-2900
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BAREND PETRUS VAN JAARSVELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN JAARSVELD is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2006 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2006 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 21 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Nov 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 2009 |