skip to content

Vakili, Maryam

CPSO#: 87178

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cornwall community hospital
Department of Radiology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: 613-938-4240 Ext. 3362
Fax: 613-938-5374 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Maryam Vakili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Vakili ( CPSO# 87178 )

Business Address:
Cornwall Community Hospital
Department of Radiology
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6G 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 938-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Glengarry Memorial Hospital Alexandria

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:03 Nov 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARYAM VAKILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAKILI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2010 to 23 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 24 Mar 2011 to 03 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2011 to 03 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2013